EP3892094 - INSECT TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hikari Bio Inc. 1144 Mimayacho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa, 761-8042 / JP | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROTA Norifumi c/o HIKARI BIO Inc., 1144 Mimayacho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-8042 / JP | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19893379.8 | 22.05.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019JP20202 | Priority number, date | JP20180229608 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018229608 | [2021/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020115927 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892094 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/04, A01M1/08, A01M1/10 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A01M1/04 (EP,KR);
A01M1/08 (EP,KR);
A01M1/06 (KR);
A01M1/10 (KR);
A01M1/106 (EP);
A01M2200/01 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | A01M1/04, A01M1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | INSEKTENFALLE | [2021/41] | English: | INSECT TRAP | [2021/41] | French: | PIÈGE À INSECTES | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | Translation filed | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 27.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02245132 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2005229997 (N BII T KK) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraphs 1,9 * * page 3, paragraphs 13-18 * * page 4, paragraph 24 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2006180855 (N BII T KK) [Y] 1,7-9 * page 2, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraphs 17-20 ** figure - *; | [Y]JP2008154462 (KAMOI KAKOSHI CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 27 *; | [Y]JP2014083007 (HIKARI BIO INC) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 7, 8, 10, 11,15 * * page 4, paragraphs 18, 19, 23-27 * * page 5, paragraphs 28-30, 32, 33,36,37 * * page 6, paragraphs 38,40,41,43-46 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPH02245132 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001258454 (N BII T KK) [A] 1-11* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005046018 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005229997 (N BII T KK) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016], [0017], fig. 1 & KR 10-2006-0043085 A & CN 1659960 A *; | [Y]JP2006180855 (N BII T KK) [Y] 7, 9-11 * , paragraph [0018] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008154462 (KAMOI KAKOSHI CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * , paragraph [0027] & JP 4009658 B1 *; | [Y]JP2014083007 (HIKARI BIO INC) [Y] 1, 5-11 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0049], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2016203840 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 9-11 * , paragraph [0028] & US 2018/0055033 A1, paragraph [0038] & WO 2016/203787 A1 & CN 107613766 A *; | [Y]KR20180004659 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-11 * , paragraph [0154] & US 2019/0133106 A1, paragraph [0128] & WO 2018/008923 A1 & KR 10-2018-0004652 A & KR 10-2018-0004653 A *; | [A]JP2018108046 (MINORU IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2000000049 |