EP3892880 - POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. 7000-36 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAWA, Yoshihiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 02 /
CHEN, Han Hiong c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 03 /
KATAOKA, Makoto c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 04 /
MURAI, Masataka c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo, 7000-46, Nakagawa, Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19893997.7 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019JP47407 | Priority number, date | JP20180227994 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018227994 | [2021/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020116506 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892880 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/52, F16D43/12, F16D43/206 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
F16D13/56 (EP);
F16D13/60 (CN);
F16D43/12 (EP,US);
B60K17/02 (US);
F16D13/52 (US);
F16D13/58 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | Translation filed | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2011012795 (F C C:KK) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2016088860 (FCC KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-24 *; | [A]WO2018116638 (EXEDY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JPS54140051 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]JPS6252228 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-5; | [A]WO2013183588 (FCC KK [JP]) [A] 1-5; | [A]WO2016143551 (EXEDY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2017155883 (F C C:KK) [A] 1-5; | [A]WO2018116638 (EXEDY CORP [JP])[A] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2017155884 |