EP3950954 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING PROGNOSIS OF ENDOMETRIAL CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keio University 15-45, Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8345 / JP | For all designated states Sekisui Medical Co., Ltd. 1-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Yae c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 02 /
ARAI, Eri c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Daisuke c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 04 /
SUSUMU, Nobuyuki c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGAMI, Wataru c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 06 /
MAKABE, Takeshi c/o School of Medicine, Keio University 35, Shinanomachi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KANAI, Yae Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
ARAI, Eri Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
AOKI, Daisuke Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
04 /
SUSUMU, Nobuyuki Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAGAMI, Wataru Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
06 /
MAKABE, Takeshi Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19894068.6 | 05.12.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019JP47656 | Priority number, date | JP20180228276 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018228276 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020116573 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950954 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6886, G01N33/50 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2500/00 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PROGNOSE VON ENDOMETRIUMKARZINOM | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING PROGNOSIS OF ENDOMETRIAL CANCER | [2022/06] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR DÉTERMINER LE PRONOSTIC D'UN CANCER DE L'ENDOMÈTRE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2021 | Translation filed | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013033627 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 9-12 * GS_NUC_ALERT:WO2013033627.47388 *; | [X] - NICOLAS WENTZENSEN ET AL, "Discovery and validation of methylation markers for endometrial cancer", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (20140331), vol. 135, no. 8, doi:10.1002/IJC.28843, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 1860 - 1868, XP071288171 [X] 1,3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.28843 | [I] - MAKABE T ET AL, "Genome-wide DNA methylation analysis in young-onset endometrial cancer", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20180901), Database accession no. EMB-624278171, XP002807032 [I] 2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF GYNECOLOGICAL CANCER 20180901 LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS AND WILKINS NLD, (20180901), vol. 28, no. Supplement 2, ISSN 1525-1438, pages 79 CONF 20180914 to 20180916 Kyoto - 17th Bien | [I] - MAKABE T, "Genome-wide DNA methylation profile of young-onset endometrial cancer", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20181201), Database accession no. EMB-626626571, XP002807033 [I] 2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - CANCER SCIENCE 20181201 BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD NLD, (20181201), vol. 109, no. Supplement 2, ISSN 1349-7006, pages 1304 CONF 20180927 to 20180929 Osaka - 77th Annu | [T] - TAKESHI MAKABE ET AL, "Genome-wide DNA methylation profile of early-onset endometrial cancer: its correlation with genetic aberrations and comparison with late-onset endometrial cancer", CARCINOGENESIS, GB, (20190309), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1093/carcin/bgz046, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 611 - 623, XP055717970 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgz046 | International search | [XA]US2008254470 (BERLIN KURT [DE]) [X] 1-3, 7-9 * claims 1-2, 9, paragraphs [0057], [0061], [0147], [0247] * [A] 4-6, 10-12; | [X]JP2011160711 (KEIO GIJUKU) [X] 1-12 * claim 2, paragraphs [0005], [0025], [0036], [0047], table 1 *; | [XA]JP2015526096 (NATIONAL DEFENSE MEDICAL CENTER) [X] 1-3, 7-9 * claim 38, paragraph [0014], table 1 * [A] 4-6, 10-12; | [X] - Makabe, Takeshi; Arai, Eri; Hirasawa, Akira; Yamagami, Wataru; Susumu, Nobuyuki; Aoki, Daisuke; Kanai, Yae, "P-3079: Genome-wide DNA methylation profile of juvenile endometrial cancer", Abstracts of the 77th Annual Academic General Conference of the Japanese Cancer Association; September 27-29, 2018, JP, (20180929), vol. 77, page 1304, XP009527944 [X] 1-12 | [X] - Makabe T, "Genetic and epigenetic characterization of young-onset endometrial cancer", Journal of Japan Society of Obstetrics and Gynecology, (20180201), vol. 70, no. 2, ISSN 0300-9165, page 526, XP009527871 [X] 1-12 | [PX] - Takeshi Makabe, Arai Eri, Hirano Takuro, Ito Nanako, Fukamachi Yukihiro, Takahashi Yoriko, Hirasawa Akira, Yamagami Wataru, Susumu Nobuyuki, Aoki Daisuke, Kanai Yae, "Genome-wide DNA methylation profile of early-onset endometrial cancer: its correlation with genetic aberrations and comparison with late-onset endometrial cancer", Carcinogenesis, (20190309), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1093/carcin/bgz046, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 611 - 623, XP055717970 [PX] 1-12 * , abstract, fig. 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgz046 | by applicant | WO2012108516 | WO2013168644 | WO2015129916 | - J. Gynecol. Oncol., (20180000), vol. 29, page e21 | - PLoS One, (20170000), vol. 12, page e0173242 | - Epigenetics, (20170000), vol. 12, pages 19 - 26 | - BMC Genomics, (20140000), vol. 15, page 868 | - Epigenetics, (20130000), vol. 8, pages 1355 - 72 | - CLARK SJ et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 2990 - 7 | - JURINKE C et al., Mutat. Res., (20050000), vol. 573, pages 83 - 95 | - Anal. Biochem., (20000000), vol. 10, pages 103 - 110 | - WOJDACZ TK et al., Nat. Protoc., (20080000), vol. 3, pages 1903 - 8 | - KRISTENSEN LS et al., Clin. Chem., (20090000), vol. 55, pages 1471 - 83 |