EP3892066 - AUTOMATIC TRIMMING FOR A DIMMER SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hubbell Incorporated 40 Waterview Drive Shelton, CT 06484-1000 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUS, Nicholas Charles c/o Hubbell Incorporated 40 Waterview Drive Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US | 02 /
TETREAULT, Michael Dennis c/o Hubbell Incorporated 40 Waterview Drive Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19894090.0 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019US56893 | Priority number, date | US201862776553P | 07.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862776553 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117382 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892066 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3892066 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/14, // H05B45/14 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H05B47/14 (EP);
H05B45/10 (US);
G01R21/01 (US);
H05B45/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | H05B33/02, H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES TRIMMEN FÜR EINEN DIMMERSCHALTER | [2021/41] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRIMMING FOR A DIMMER SWITCH | [2021/41] | French: | RÉGLAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN GRADATEUR | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.01.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018020529 (CARTRETTE JONATHAN P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-14 * the whole document *[I] 6,9,15 | International search | [A]US2013038234 (VAN DER VEEN GEERT WILLEM [NL], et al) [A] 1-20* ; the entire document *; | [A]US8461503 (LEINEN RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US8890418 (MOHAN TANUJ [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; the entire document * | by applicant | US2018020529 |