EP3895775 - FILTER LIFE PREDICTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMASHIN FILTER CORP. 1-1-8, Sakuragi-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0062 / JP | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAJIMA Nobuyuki c/o, YAMASHIN-FILTER CORP. Yokohama R&D Center, 5- 32-84, Sugita, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0033 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI Nobuki c/o, YAMASHIN-FILTER CORP. Yokohama R&D Center, 5- 32-84, Sugita, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0033 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19894777.2 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019JP46956 | Priority number, date | JP20180231947 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018231947 | [2021/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020121861 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895775 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895775 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/00, B01D24/00, B01D35/02, G01L9/14 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B01D29/21 (EP);
B01D35/1435 (CN);
B01D35/143 (EP,US);
B01D29/606 (EP);
G01L15/00 (EP);
G01L9/14 (EP);
B01D2201/291 (EP);
B01D2201/302 (EP);
B01D2201/304 (EP);
G01F1/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DER LEBENSDAUER EINES FILTERS | [2021/42] | English: | FILTER LIFE PREDICTION DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉDICTION DE DURÉE DE VIE DE FILTRE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | Translation filed | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011054811 (CONTINI PASCAL CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al); | [A]JP2017137835 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2018066665 (YAMASHIN FILTER CORP); | [A]US2018185775 (KUHNS MATTHEW M [US]) | International search | [A]JP2001518187 ; | [A]JP2004044585 (DETROIT DIESEL CORP); | [A]JP2009156174 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO); | [A]JP2010064031 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2010227899 (METAWATER CO LTD); | [A]JP2018066665 (YAMASHIN FILTER CORP) | by applicant | JPS61909Y |