EP3896163 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND PURIFYING RECOMBINANT HUMAN FIBRONECTIN FROM GENETICALLY ENGINEERED RICE SEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WUHAN HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CORP No.666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan Hubei 430079 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Daichang 666 Gaoxin Avenue, East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430079 / CN | 02 /
ZHAN, Quan 666 Gaoxin Avenue, East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430079 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19894910.9 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN123762 | Priority number, date | CN201811505129 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811505129 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119609 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896163 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/15, C12N15/63, C12N15/82, A01H5/10, C07K14/81, C07K1/18 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K1/18 (KR,US);
A01H5/10 (KR);
B01D15/203 (US);
B01D15/362 (US);
B01D15/363 (US);
B01D15/426 (US);
C07K1/145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG UND REINIGUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM MENSCHLICHEM FIBRONECTIN AUS GENMANIPULIERTEM REISSAMEN | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING AND PURIFYING RECOMBINANT HUMAN FIBRONECTIN FROM GENETICALLY ENGINEERED RICE SEED | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ET DE PURIFICATION DE FIBRONECTINE HUMAINE RECOMBINÉE À PARTIR DE GRAINES DE RIZ GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉES | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2021 | Translation filed | 03.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012083580 (HEALTHGEN BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al); |