EP3874213 - REFRIGERATOR WITH VARIABLE ICE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCALF, Eric 3507 Ridge Top Court Louisville 40241 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/36] | 01 /
SCALF, Eric 3507 Ridge Top Court Louisville 40241 / US | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/36] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19895323.4 | 02.07.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN94389 | Priority number, date | US201816214830 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: US201816214830 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119093 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874213 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3874213 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/12 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
F25D23/126 (EP,US);
F25C5/22 (EP,US);
F25D29/005 (EP);
B67D1/124 (EP);
F25C2400/08 (EP);
F25C2400/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK MIT VARIABLEM EISSPENDER | [2024/11] | English: | REFRIGERATOR WITH VARIABLE ICE DISPENSER | [2021/36] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR AVEC DISTRIBUTEUR VARIABLE DE GLACE | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/36] | KÜHLSCHRANK MIT SPENDER VON VARIABLEM EIS | ||
Former [2021/36] | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR DOTÉ DE DISTRIBUTEUR DE GLACE VARIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24189463.3 | EP24189509.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006169721 (HAMMONDS MARCUS M [US], et al); | [XYI]US2011132021 (FULTON TIMOTHY A [US], et al); | [YA]KR20150008763 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | International search | [A]CN1156225 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN1598451 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN1624406 (LANCER PARTNERSHIP LTD [US]); | [A]US2008121667 (PARK KYONG BAE [KR], et al); | [A]CN101738046 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [X]CN102171524 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) |