EP3895891 - RELEASE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSEKI, Yosuke c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19895436.4 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019JP43322 | Priority number, date | JP20180231903 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018231903 | [2021/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020121687 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895891 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, C09J183/04, C09J7/38, C09J7/40, B32B7/06, B32B7/12, B32B15/08, B32B15/09, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B32B27/38, B32B27/40 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
C09J7/401 (EP,US);
C09J7/40 (KR);
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B15/082 (EP);
B32B15/085 (EP);
B32B15/088 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/092 (EP);
B32B15/095 (EP);
B32B23/042 (EP);
B32B23/06 (EP);
B32B23/08 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/283 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/286 (EP);
B32B27/288 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/325 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/12 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C08L83/08 (EP);
C09D183/04 (EP);
C09D183/08 (EP);
C09J183/04 (EP,KR);
C09J183/08 (EP);
C09J7/38 (KR);
C09J7/403 (US);
C09J7/405 (US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2264/0214 (EP);
B32B2264/0235 (EP);
B32B2264/025 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/104 (EP);
B32B2264/12 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/21 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/584 (EP);
B32B2307/712 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (US);
B32B2307/746 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
B32B2457/202 (US);
B32B2457/208 (EP);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
C09J2203/318 (EP);
C09J2301/12 (US);
C09J2301/312 (KR);
C09J2427/005 (EP);
C09J2483/00 (EP);
C09J2483/005 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP);
C08L83/08, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP);
C09D183/04, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP);
C09D183/08, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/42] | B32B27/00, C09J183/04, C09J7/38, C09J7/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | TRENNFOLIE | [2021/42] | English: | RELEASE FILM | [2021/42] | French: | PELLICULE ANTIADHÉSIVE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2021 | Translation filed | 08.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0577364 (LINTEC CORP) [X] 1,3-8,13-16,27 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0010] - paragraphs [0015] , [0019]; example 1; claim - *; | [XP]WO2019117059 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; examples 1,3-5; claims 1,2,4-8 *; | [XP]WO2019208141 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XP] 1,13-16,27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] , [0014] , [0026] - paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0055] , [0056]; claims 1,4-6,8 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Diphenyl", Römpp online, (20070401), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://roempp.thieme.de/lexicon/RD-04-01901?searchterm=diphenyl&context=search, (20220317), XP055902670 [A] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]JPH0577364 (LINTEC CORP) [X] 5-8, 13-16, 27 * , claims, paragraphs [0007], [0009], [0011]-[0013], [0040], paragraph [0003] * [Y] 9-10, 17-26; | [Y]JP2005029712 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 19-22, 24-26 * , claims, paragraphs [0029]-[0033], [0049], [0055] *; | [A]JP2012196846 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC) [A] 1-27 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0005], [0008] *; | [Y]WO2016152992 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 9-10, 23-26 * , claims, paragraphs [0011], [0110] *; | [PY]JP2018203873 (LINTEC CORP) [PY] 17-18, 23, 25- 26 * , claims, paragraphs [0035]-[0043] *; | [PA]WO2019117059 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-27* , claims, paragraphs [0017], [0024], [0025], [0061], comparative examples 4, 5 *; | [PA]WO2019208141 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-27 * , claims, paragraph [0007] * | by applicant | JPH01313521 | EP0602731 | JPH06295016 | US5391472 | JPH07292081 | JP2000006324 | JP2011201035 |