EP3896790 - ANTENNA STRUCTURE AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Rihui 283, BBK Road,Wusha,Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19895745.8 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN117441 | Priority number, date | CN201811521132 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811521132 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119366 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896790 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3896790 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q5/335, H01Q5/40, H01Q9/42, H01Q1/24 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H01Q5/335 (EP);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q9/0442 (US);
H01Q1/22 (CN);
H01Q1/2258 (CN);
H01Q1/242 (CN);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/44 (CN);
H01Q5/10 (CN);
H01Q5/28 (CN);
H01Q5/307 (CN);
H01Q5/314 (CN);
H01Q5/328 (CN,US);
H01Q5/40 (EP);
H01Q5/50 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H01Q1/44, H01Q5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENSTRUKTUR UND KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT | [2021/42] | English: | ANTENNA STRUCTURE AND COMMUNICATION TERMINAL | [2021/42] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ANTENNE ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2021 | Translation filed | 06.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | LU | 12.11.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 12.11.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN108631041 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13,15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4-6,9,11 [I] 3,10,14; | [XI]CN108832267 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0064]; figures 2,3 *[I] 13; | [XAI]CN108879116 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7,8,15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0104]; figure 2 * [A] 4-6,9,11 [I] 3,10,12-14 |