EP3896626 - DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD, DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNAGAMI, Yuji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SOEDA, Junichiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19896929.7 | 10.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019JP48189 | Priority number, date | US201862777908P | 11.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862777908 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122039 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896626 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/06, G06Q10/00, G06F16/22, G06F16/23, G06F16/27, H04L9/32, H04L29/06 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/275 (EP,US);
G06F16/2308 (EP,US);
G06Q10/00 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L9/3213 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
H04L2209/805 (EP);
H04L63/123 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | DATENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, DATENVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2021/42] | English: | DATA MANAGEMENT METHOD, DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE DONNÉES, SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DONNÉES ET PROGRAMME | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2021 | Translation filed | 21.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2531828 (INTELLIGENT ENERGY LTD [GB]); | International search | [XYA]JP2018112827 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [YA]JP2018128723 (HITACHI LTD) |