EP3894868 - COMBINATORIAL TEMPORAL BIOMARKERS AND PRECISION MEDICINES WITH DETECTION AND TREATMENT METHODS FOR USE IN NEURO INJURY, NEURO DISEASE, AND NEURO REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gryphon Bio, Inc 2 Townsend Apt. 1-410 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611-5500 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASKINS, William, E. 1 Mandalay Place, 915 San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
WANG, Kevin, Ka-wang 9966 Sw 19th Lane Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19897288.7 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019US66346 | Priority number, date | US201862779051P | 13.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862779051 P | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020124013 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894868 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/53 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2800/56 (EP,US);
G01N2800/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | KOMBINATORISCHE ZEITLICHE BIOMARKER UND PRÄZISIONSARZNEIMITTEL MIT DETEKTIONS- UND BEHANDLUNGSMETHODEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI NERVENLÄSIONEN, NERVENERKRANKUNGEN UND NERVENREPARATUREN | [2021/42] | English: | COMBINATORIAL TEMPORAL BIOMARKERS AND PRECISION MEDICINES WITH DETECTION AND TREATMENT METHODS FOR USE IN NEURO INJURY, NEURO DISEASE, AND NEURO REPAIR | [2021/42] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS TEMPORAUX COMBINATOIRES ET MÉDICAMENTS DE PRÉCISION AVEC MÉTHODES DE DÉTECTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS UNE LÉSION NEURONALE, UNE MALADIE NEURONALE ET UNE RÉPARATION NEURONALE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017176460 (LARNER STEPHEN [US]); | [X]EP2321355 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | International search | [Y]US2015141528 (LARNER STEPHEN [US]); | [Y]WO2015157390 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]); | [A]WO2016081100 (GE HEALTHCARE UK LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2016154010 (O'BRYANT SID E [US], et al); |