EP3895853 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MITIGATING COLLISION OF SURGICAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 14.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meere Company Inc. 69-12 Jeongmunsongsan-ro Yanggam-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18630 / KR | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jong Do 103-804, 20, Maebong-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16527 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Tae Won 860-1904, 102, Surisan-ro Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do 15823 / KR | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19897325.7 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019KR14697 | Priority number, date | KR20180161177 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180161177 | [2021/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122416 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895853 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, B25J19/02, B25J19/06, A61B34/37, A61B34/00, A61B90/00 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61B34/37 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/1692 (KR);
A61B34/74 (KR);
A61B34/76 (KR);
A61B90/00 (EP);
A61B90/03 (KR);
B25J13/085 (US);
B25J19/02 (KR);
B25J19/06 (KR,US);
B25J9/1666 (KR,US);
B25J9/1676 (EP,KR,US);
B25J9/1689 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00119 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00128 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00212 (KR);
A61B2034/2059 (EP);
A61B2090/066 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/067 (EP,KR);
A61B2090/0811 (EP);
A61B90/37 (EP);
B25J13/088 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOLLISIONSABSCHWÄCHUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN ROBOTERS | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MITIGATING COLLISION OF SURGICAL ROBOT | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'ATTÉNUER LA COLLISION D'UN ROBOT CHIRURGICAL | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2021 | Translation filed | 08.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017128136 (POST NICHOLAS JON [US]); | [I]WO2017169098 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [I]WO2017214243 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]); | [X]US2017367774 (SCHOLAN ANDREW [GB]); | [I]US2018079090 (KOENIG KAREN SHAKESPEAR [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2006116650 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [YA]JP2011517419 ; | [A]CN104985598 (ESTUN ROBOTICS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2017177255 (SONY CORP); | [Y]KR20180067652 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) |