EP3899144 - WIRE ROPE SAFETY BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fletcher Building Holdings Limited 810 Great South Road Penrose, Auckland 1061 / NZ | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Fletcher Building Holdings Limited 810 Great South Road Penrose Auckland 1061 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIECZOREK, Wojciech 3/326 Great North Road Manurewa, Auckland 2102 / NZ | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/43] | 01 /
WIECZOREK, Wojciech 3/326 Great North Road Manurewa Auckland, 2102 / NZ | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/13] |
Former [2021/43] | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19897585.6 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019IB61062 | Priority number, date | NZ18749587 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: NZ 18749587 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128929 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899144 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3899144 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/06 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
E01F15/06 (EP,AU,US);
E01F15/0461 (US);
E01F15/143 (AU);
E04H17/124 (AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTSEILSICHERHEITSSPERRE | [2021/43] | English: | WIRE ROPE SAFETY BARRIER | [2021/43] | French: | BARRIÈRE DE SÉCURITÉ À CÂBLE MÉTALLIQUE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 28.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017126979 (TROY WHEELER CONTRACTING LTD [NZ]); | [A]US2017268189 (HEINEVIK MATS [SE], et al) | International search | [A]US1801890 (WARD WILLIAM E); | [A]US2321988 (BRICKMAN ALAN E); | [A]GB2033447 (RYLAND ENG LTD); | [A]US5775675 (SICKING DEAN L [US], et al); | [A]NZ527395 (DN BROWN LTD); | [A]WO2006085183 (HAMLIN ROBERT JAMES WALLER [ZA]); | [A]US2007007501 (NEUSCH WILLIAM H [US]); | [X]WO2014077701 (VALMONT HIGHWAY TECHNOLOGY LTD [NZ]); | [A]US2016130775 (BRACKIN MICHAEL S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2014077701 | WO2017126979 | US2017268189 |