EP3842859 - REFLECTOR PLATE, BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Shiyuan Electronics Co., Ltd. No.6, 4th Yunpu Road Huangpu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | For all designated states Guangzhou Shirui Electronics Co., Ltd. No.192 Kezhu Road Guangzhou Science Park Guangzhou Economic and Technological Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Yonglin No. 6, 4th Yunpu Road, Huangpu District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19898769.5 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019CN123088 | Priority number, date | CN201822144363U | 20.12.2018 Original published format: CN 201822144363 U | [2021/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125420 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842859 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G02F1/133603 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133605 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/08 (KR);
G02B6/0031 (KR);
G02B6/0073 (KR);
G02F1/133388 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | REFLEKTORPLATTE, RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSMODUL UND ANZEIGEENDGERÄT | [2021/26] | English: | REFLECTOR PLATE, BACKLIGHT MODULE AND DISPLAY TERMINAL | [2021/26] | French: | PLAQUE DE RÉFLECTEUR, MODULE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE, ET TERMINAL D'AFFICHAGE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | Translation filed | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 22.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2007230206 (HSIAO MENG-JIA [TW], et al) [I] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 2,4B,4C,10A,10B * [A] 2; | [A]US2017184917 (YI GIHYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0089] ** figures 6,7A,7B * |