EP3897634 - COMPOUNDS FOR THE REDUCTION OF THE DELETERIOUS ACTIVITY OF EXTENDED NUCLEOTIDE REPEAT CONTAINING GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | For all designated states National Yang Ming Chiao Tung University No. 155, Sec. 2, Linong St. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Thomas W. 1455 Adams Drive, Suite 1120 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
PROBST, Gary 1455 Adams Drive, Suite 1120 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
BAIK, Jason 1455 Adams Drive, Suite 1120 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 19898813.1 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US66022 | Priority number, date | US201862781469P | 18.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862781469 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020131573 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897634 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/88, C07D401/12, C07D403/04, C07D403/12, C07D409/12, C07D471/04, C07F5/04, C07F5/05, A61K31/4439, A61P25/28 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K31/404 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4155 (US);
A61K31/437 (US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,IL,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,US);
C07B59/001 (EP,IL);
C07D209/88 (EP,IL,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,IL,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,IL);
C07D409/12 (EP,IL,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07F5/025 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
C07B2200/05 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/43] | A61K31/4439 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR REDUKTION DER SCHÄDLICHEN AKTIVITÄT VON GENEN MIT VERLÄNGERTEN NUKLEOTIDREPEAT-HALTIGEN GENEN | [2021/43] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR THE REDUCTION OF THE DELETERIOUS ACTIVITY OF EXTENDED NUCLEOTIDE REPEAT CONTAINING GENES | [2021/43] | French: | COMPOSÉS POUR LA RÉDUCTION DE L'ACTIVITÉ DÉLÉTÈRE DE GÈNES CONTENANT UNE RÉPÉTITION DE NUCLÉOTIDES ÉTENDUE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005023245 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * Abstract; claim 1; examples 15, 16, 18, 23, 25, 29, 30, 31A, 31B, 32-36, 42-49, 51-59, 61, 62, 64, 71. *; | [X]WO2005037791 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8* Abstract; claims; examples 15, 17, 22, 25-27, 30, 33, 38, 39, 44, 53, 69, 70, 80, 97, 98, 204, 209, 218, 221-223, 228, 266. *; | [X]WO2016196664 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * Page 19, paragraph 71 to page 21, paragraph 80. *; | [X]WO2017117006 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * Abstract; claims; pages 15-17, paragraph 68; pages 57, 59, 60: compounds 4, 6, 13. *; | CN107739371 [ ] (UNIV EAST CHINA NORMAL, et al); | [X] - GUDMUNDSSON ET AL., "Substituted tetrahydrocarbazoles with potent activity against human papillomaviruses", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., vol. 19, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.05.003, ISSN 0960-894X, (20090701), pages 3489 - 3492, (20090507), XP026155093 [X] 1-3,5 * Abstract; page 3490, table 1: compounds 1-17; page 2491, table 2: compounds 4, 22, 9, 26, 27. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.05.003 | [X] - Chen et al., "Method for preparing tetrahydrocarbazole-type small-molecule organic compound and its application in preparing antimicrobial drug", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20180227), Database accession no. 2018:325653, URL: STN, XP055950174 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - KIEFER ET AL., "Design and synthesis of calindol derivatives as potent and selective calcium sensing receptor agonists", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (20151212), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2015.12.019, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 554 - 569, XP029399979 [X] 1-3,5,11 * Page 559, table 3, and the paragraph bridging pages 565 and 566: compound 56 and its hydrochloride. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2015.12.019 | International search | [A]US2009170923 (GUDMUNDSSON KRISTJAN [US]) [A] 1-3, 12-14 * ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2013139929 (UNIV MUENCHEN L MAXIMILIANS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3, 12-14 * ; pg. 31, Table 43, pg. 32, In 16-20, pg. 39, In 33 *; | [A]US2018127366 (ZHANG CHENGZHI [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 12-14 * ; entire document *; | [PX]WO2018236910 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [PX] 1-3, 12-14* ; entire document *; | [Y] - CZEREDYS et al., "Tetrahydrocarbazoles decrease elevated SOCE in medium spiny neurons from transgenic YAC128 mice, a model of Huntington's disease", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (20160820), vol. 483, doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2016.08.106, pages 1194 - 1205, XP029917808 [Y] 1-3, 12-14 * ; pg. 1194, abstract, pg. 1197, Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2016.08.106 |