EP3898628 - 3-(7-((5-(ALKOXYCARBONYL)-6-(PHENYL)-2-(THIAZOL-2-YL)-3,6-DIHYDROPYRIMIDIN-4-YL)METHYL)-8A-ALKYL-3-OXOHEXAHYDROIMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-2(3H)-YL)-ALKANOIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND SIMILAR COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEPATITIS B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/43] | HETEROARYLDIHYDROPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF TREATING HEPATITIS B INFECTIONS | ||
[2023/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yanping Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Yimin Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | 03 /
TU, Wangyang Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | 04 /
DENG, Gang Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | 05 /
CHENG, Zhanling Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | 06 /
LIANG, Chao Johnson & Johnson (China) Investment Ltd., 2101, No. 1 Building, 65 Gui Qing Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Garcia Prieto, Maria, et al Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19899357.8 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019CN126735 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN122257 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/122257 | US201962791524P | 11.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962791524 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125729 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898628 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/4985, A61K45/06, A61P31/20 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A61P31/20 (EP,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
C07D417/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D513/04, C07D498/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | 20.07.2021 | ME | 20.07.2021 | Validation states | KH | 20.07.2021 | MA | 20.07.2021 | MD | 20.07.2021 | TN | 20.07.2021 | Title | German: | 3-(7-((5-(ALKOXYCARBONYL)-6-(PHENYL)-2-(THIAZOL-2-YL)-3,6-DIHYDROPYRIMIDIN-4-YL)METHYL)-8A-ALKYL-3-OXOHEXAHYDROIMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-2(3H)-YL)-ALKANSÄUREDERIVATE UND ÄHNLICHE VERBINDUNGENZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HEPATITIS B | [2023/26] | English: | 3-(7-((5-(ALKOXYCARBONYL)-6-(PHENYL)-2-(THIAZOL-2-YL)-3,6-DIHYDROPYRIMIDIN-4-YL)METHYL)-8A-ALKYL-3-OXOHEXAHYDROIMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-2(3H)-YL)-ALKANOIC ACID DERIVATIVES AND SIMILAR COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEPATITIS B | [2023/26] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE ALKANOIQUE DE 3-(7-((5-(ALKOXYCARBONYL)-6-(PHENYL)-2-(THIAZOL-2-YL)-3,6-DIHYDROPYRIMIDIN-4-YL)METHYL)-8A-ALKYL-3-OXOHEXAHYDROIMIDAZO[1,5-A]PYRAZIN-2(3H)-YL)- ET COMPOSÉS SIMILAIRES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HÉPATITE B | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/43] | HETEROARYLDIHYDROPYRIMIDINDERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HEPATITIS-B-INFEKTIONEN | ||
Former [2021/43] | HETEROARYLDIHYDROPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND METHODS OF TREATING HEPATITIS B INFECTIONS | ||
Former [2021/43] | DÉRIVÉS D'HÉTÉROARYLDIHYDROPYRIMIDINE ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS PAR LE VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE B | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 06.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]WO2019076310 (SUNSHINE LAKE PHARMA CO LTD [CN]) [IP] 1-15 * page 93; example 62; table 2 * * page 190 - page 195; example 62 * * claims 1-4, 12, 18 * * claim 12; compounds 62, 119, 127 ** claim 12; compounds 1-7, 9, 10, 62, 72, 76, 81, 86-88, 108 * |