EP3898998 - MODIFIED ORTHOPOXVIRUS VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ottawa Hospital Research Institute 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6 / CA | For all designated states TURNSTONE BIOLOGICS CORP. 920 Broadway, 16th Floor New York, NY 10010 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, John C. 248 Knox Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0K8 / CA | 02 /
HUH, Michael S. 577 Ozawa Private Ottawa, Ontario K1K 4Z9 / CA | 03 /
TANG, Matthew Y. 5938 Meadowglen Drive Orleans, Ontario K1C 5Z6 / CA | 04 /
PELIN, Adrian 1010 16th St, Unit 328 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | 05 /
BREITBACH, Caroline J. 46 Belmont Street, Unit 2 Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | 06 /
BURGESS, Michael F. 9 Meadowbrook Road Chester, New Jersey 07930 / US | 07 /
BERNSTEIN, Steven H. 2739 Main Street Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19899693.6 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019CA51898 | Priority number, date | US201862784372P | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784372 P | US201962872699P | 10.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962872699 P | US201962930524P | 04.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930524 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020124273 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898998 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/863, A61K35/768, A61P35/00, C07K14/065, C07K16/28, C12N15/12, C12N15/13, C12N15/19, C12N15/24, C12N15/39, C12N15/52, C12N5/10, C12N7/01 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/768 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/52 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/5434 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
C12N2710/24121 (EP,IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE ORTHOPOXVIRUS-VEKTOREN | [2021/43] | English: | MODIFIED ORTHOPOXVIRUS VECTORS | [2021/43] | French: | VECTEURS D'ORTHOPOXVIRUS MODIFIÉS | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016008976 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [AP]WO2019134048 (BELL JOHN C [CA], et al) [AP] 1-15 * figure 40; example 22; table 2 *; | [AP] - Pelin Adrian ET AL, "Bio-Engineering Vaccinia Viruses for Increased Oncolytic Potential", doi:10.20381/ruor-24148, (20191202), URL: https://ruor.uottawa.ca/handle/10393/39909, (20220628), XP055935967 [AP] 1-15 * see chapter 3; pages 101-103; figure 3.16; table 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.20381/ruor-24148 | International search | [A] - VERARDI et al., "Vaccinia Virus Vectors with an Inactivated Gamma Interferon Receptor Homolog Gene (B8R) Are Attenuated In Vivo without a Concomitant Reduction in Immunogenicity", Journal of Virology, (20010100), vol. 75, no. 1, doi:10.1128/JVI.75.1.11-18.2001, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 11 - 18, XP002409049 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.1.11-18.2001 | [A] - CURRAN et al., "Tumor Vaccines Expressing Flt3-Ligand Synergize with CTLA-4 Blockade to Reject Pre-Implanted Tumors", Cancer Research, (20091001), vol. 69, no. 19, ISSN 1538-7445, pages 7747 - 7755, XP055177400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-3289 | [A] - VOM BERG et al., "Intratumoral IL -12 combined with CTLA-4 blockade elicits T cell mediate, glioma rejection", The Journal of Experimental Medicine, (20130000), vol. 210, no. 13, doi:10.1084/jem.20130678, ISSN 1540-9538, pages 2803 - 2811, XP055513130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20130678 | [A] - DE GRAAF et al., "Armed oncolytic viruses: A kick-start for anti-tumor immunity", Cytokine and Growth Factor Reviews, (20180319), vol. 41, doi:10.1016/j.cytogfr.2018.03.006, ISSN 1359-6101, pages 28 - 39, XP055580278 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cytogfr.2018.03.006 | [A] - VAN DER JEUGHT et al., "Targeting the tumor microenvironment to enhance antitumor immune responses", Oncotarget, (20141226), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1949-2553, pages 1359 - 1381, XP055351674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18632/oncotarget.3204 |