EP3898790 - SURFACE-TREATED FIBROUS MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEISKANEN, Isto Kanava-aukio 10 as 13-14 55100 Imatra / FI | 02 /
LYYTIKÄINEN, Katja Ratavallinkaari 2 55700 Imatra / FI | 03 /
CUNHA, Gisela Atlasvägen 39 131 34 Nacka / SE | 04 /
BACKFOLK, Kaj Imatrantie 13 A6 53100 Lappeenranta / FI | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19900405.2 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019IB61182 | Priority number, date | SE20180051645 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: SE 1851645 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128997 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898790 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21H11/18, C08J5/18, B32B29/00, B82Y30/00, D21H17/66, D21H19/10 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
D21H17/70 (EP);
C08J5/18 (SE);
D21H11/18 (EP,SE,US);
B32B29/00 (EP,SE);
B82Y30/00 (EP,SE);
D21H11/20 (US);
D21H17/10 (EP);
D21H17/66 (EP,SE,US);
D21H19/10 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | C08J5/18, B32B29/00, B82Y30/00, D21H11/18, D21H17/66, D21H19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE FASERMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2021/43] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED FIBROUS MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [2021/43] | French: | MATÉRIAUX FIBREUX TRAITÉS EN SURFACE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/37] | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2826792 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,11,12,16,18 * paragraphs [0003] , [0063] , [0047]; claims 1-5 * [Y] 1-18 [I] 2,5,6,9,10,13,17; | [Y]US2016145480 (KRIGSTIN SALLY [CA], et al) [Y] 1-18 * claims 1-40 *; | [A]WO2018002815 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018083592 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A] - NADERI ALI ET AL, "Phosphorylated nanofibrillated cellulose: production and properties", vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.3183/NPPRJ-2016-31-01-P020-029, ISSN 0283-2631, (20160101), pages 20 - 29, NORDIC PULP & PAPER RESEARCH JOURNAL, STOCKHOLM, SE, URL: http://www.degruyter.com/view/j/npprj.2016.31.issue-1/npprj-2016-31-01-p020-029/npprj-2016-31-01-p020-029.xml, XP009521909 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3183/npprj-2016-31-01-p020-029 | International search | [A]EP2371893 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * ; paragraphs [0056], [0059], [0102] *; | [A]WO2014181560 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: PAJ database; Original document: paragraphs [0009]-[0010]; [0071]-[0073]; [0079] *; | [A]JP2014223737 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: PAJ database; Original document: abstract *; | [A]EP2884000 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * ; claims 1-2 *; | [XY]JP2017031538 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [X] 16-18 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: PAJ database; Original document: paragraphs [0008] and [0062] * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP3333316 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [X] 16-18 * ; paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0016]-[0018], [0023]-[0027], [0036]-[0038], [0055]-[0059], [0068]-[0074], [0105], [0114]-[0117]; claims 6,13,14 * [Y] 1-15; | [A]EP3412713 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * ; claims 1,4-5 *; | [PY]WO2019123360 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI]) [PY] 1-18* ; abstract; page 5, line 3 - page 5, line 9; page 5, line 15 - page 5, line 23; claims 1,9 *; | [PY]EP3581590 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]) [PY] 1-18 * ; abstract; claims 1-2 *; | [A] - NADERI, A. et al., "Phosphorylated nanofibrillated cellulose: production and properties", Nordic Pulp and Paper Research Journal, (20160000), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.3183/npprj-2016-31-01-p020-029, pages 20 - 29, XP009521909 [A] 1-18 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3183/npprj-2016-31-01-p020-029 |