EP3899510 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REAL-TIME MEASUREMENT OF FISSILE CONTENT WITHIN CHEMICAL AND MATERIAL HANDLING PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUCKER, David L. 127 Pelican Drive Chapin, South Carolina 29036 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Steinerstraße 15/A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 19900643.8 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US66440 | Priority number, date | US201816227426 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US201816227426 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020131653 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899510 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/222, G01V5/00, G21C17/06, G21C21/02 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G01V5/281 (EP);
G01N23/005 (KR);
G01T1/40 (US);
G01N23/222 (EP);
G01T3/00 (EP,KR);
G21C17/06 (EP);
G21C21/02 (EP);
G21G1/10 (US);
G01N2223/106 (EP);
G01N2223/1063 (EP);
G01N2223/1066 (EP);
G01N2223/305 (EP);
G01N2223/306 (EP);
G01N2223/625 (EP);
G01N2223/645 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | G01N23/00, G01T3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ECHTZEITMESSUNG DES SPALTSTOFFGEHALTS IN CHEMISCHEN UND MATERIALHANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REAL-TIME MEASUREMENT OF FISSILE CONTENT WITHIN CHEMICAL AND MATERIAL HANDLING PROCESSES | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE EN TEMPS RÉEL DE CONTENU FISSILE AU SEIN DE PROCESSUS DE MANIPULATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES ET DE MATÉRIAUX | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4515749 (SCHOENIG JR FREDERICK C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 27 *; | [A]US5049351 (AHMED HASSAN J [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]JPH04326095 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1,2,4,8-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]WO2006015863 (SVED JOHN [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-11,13-15 * abstract * * figures 2,4-6 * * page 2, line 18 - page 11, line 33 * * page 20, line 24 - page 23, line 15 * * page 24, line 13 - page 29, line 12 *; | [A]US2010061500 (LOU TAK PUI [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]US2010284504 (LE TOURNEUR PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3-4 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0127] *; | [Y]CN106990428 (NUCLEAR POWER INST CHINA) [Y] 1,2,4,8-15 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0060] * | International search | [YX]US2003179843 (BERNARDIN BRUNO [FR]) [Y] 2-11,14-16,19-25,27-31 [X] 1,12,13,17,18,26; | [Y]US2010061500 (LOU TAK PUI [US], et al) [Y] 2-11,14-16,19-25,27-31; | [A]US7786431 (DONOFRIO RAYMOND S [US], et al) [A] 1-31; | [A]KR100988574B [A] 1-31; | [A]US2012091327 (HOLADAY VELDON D [US], et al) [A] 1-31 | by applicant | US4515749 | JPH04326095 | US2010284504 | CN106990428 |