EP3904340 - SYNTHESIS METHOD FOR HALOFUGINONE AND INTERMEDIATE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Launch-Pharma Technologies, Ltd. 5th Floor, Building D 188 Kaiyuan Avenue The Science Park of Guangzhou High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Yehua 5th Floor, Building D, 188 Kaiyuan Avenue, The Science Park of Guangzhou High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | 02 /
QIU, Fayang 5th Floor, Building D, 188 Kaiyuan Avenue, The Science Park of Guangzhou High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | 03 /
XU, Hua 5th Floor, Building D, 188 Kaiyuan Avenue, The Science Park of Guangzhou High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | 04 /
YIN, Wenhao 5th Floor, Building D, 188 Kaiyuan Avenue, The Science Park of Guangzhou High-Tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | [2023/27] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
JIN, Yehua Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | ||
02 /
QIU, Fayang Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | |||
03 /
XU, Hua Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | |||
04 /
YIN, Wenhao Guangzhou, Guangdong 510530 / CN | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2021/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19902141.1 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019CN106485 | Priority number, date | CN201811626095 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811626095 | CN20191090473 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910090473 | [2021/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020134212 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904340 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3904340 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/42, C07D401/06 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
C07C69/92 (EP);
C07D211/42 (EP,US);
B01J31/0239 (US);
C07C69/76 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESEVERFAHREN FÜR HALOFUGINON UND ZWISCHENPRODUKT DAVON | [2021/44] | English: | SYNTHESIS METHOD FOR HALOFUGINONE AND INTERMEDIATE THEREOF | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SYNTHÈSE D'UNE HALOFUGINONE ET D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE DE CELLE-CI | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | Translation filed | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | IE | 18.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | GB | 05.10.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
IE | 18.09.2023 | ||
GB | 05.10.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 05.10.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101987843 (UNIV NANKAI, et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]CN103275063 (CHONGQING WEIPENG PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15* claim - * |