EP3889865 - METHOD FOR HANDLING RELAY ATTACK AND SECURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xiaona Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19903377.0 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019CN122310 | Priority number, date | CN201811639972 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811639972 | [2021/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020134876 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889865 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32, H04L29/06 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,CN);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06Q20/3227 (EP);
G06Q20/352 (EP);
G06Q20/382 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RELAISANGRIFF UND GESICHERTES ELEMENT | [2021/40] | English: | METHOD FOR HANDLING RELAY ATTACK AND SECURE ELEMENT | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE GÉRER UNE ATTAQUE DE RELAIS ET ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | Translation filed | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011115860 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2018169522 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0073] ** paragraph [0077] * |