EP3905406 - BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Yuta c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Izuru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
SUGIMOTO, Yuta Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAKI, Izuru Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19904184.9 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019JP47354 | Priority number, date | JP20180244144 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018244144 | [2021/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020137389 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905406 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01M10/058 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M2300/008 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0094 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01M10/0585 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | BATTERIE | [2021/44] | English: | BATTERY | [2021/44] | French: | BATTERIE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2021 | Translation filed | 19.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7931989 (KLAASSEN JODY J [US]) [A] 1-8 * last paragraph; column 8; figure 9 *; | [A]EP3404740 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0048] , [0 52] , [0 53] , [0 56] , [ 139] , [ 278] *; | [AP]EP3512021 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-8 * figures 4, 11a-11d * * paragraphs [0075] - [0078] *; | [A] - ZHU YIZHOU ET AL, "Origin of Outstanding Stability in the Lithium Solid Electrolyte Materials: Insights from Thermodynamic Analyses Based on First-Principles Calculations", APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, US, vol. 7, no. 42, doi:10.1021/acsami.5b07517, ISSN 1944-8244, (20151015), pages 23685 - 23693, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acsami.5b07517, XP055779181 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsami.5b07517 | International search | [A]WO2014010043 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8; | [A]JP2015153647 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8; | [A]JP2017152324 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-8; | [A]JP2018195573 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP)[A] 1-8 | by applicant | WO2015030052 |