EP3893154 - RECOMMENDATION MODEL TRAINING METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Hong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DONG, Zhenhua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Ruiming Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yuzhou Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
QIAN, Li Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19904863.8 | 25.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019CN128475 | Priority number, date | CN201811653380 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811653380 | [2021/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020135535 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893154 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06F16/735, G06F16/78, G06F16/9535 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/735 (EP);
G06F16/78 (EP);
G06F18/217 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N5/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | G06K9/62, G06F16/735, G06F16/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | EMPFEHLUNGSMODELLTRAININGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | RECOMMENDATION MODEL TRAINING METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE DE MODÈLE DE RECOMMANDATION ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2021 | Translation filed | 08.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2024 | 10.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/43] | 17.06.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN107578332 (SHENZHEN LEXIN SOFTWARE TECH CO LTD); | [I]CN107729488 (BEIJING SOHU NEW MEDIA INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); |