EP3903666 - DISEASE PREDICTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kenichi c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
KYOMOTO, Masayuki c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
WATANABE, Kenichi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
KYOMOTO, Masayuki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19905160.8 | 24.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019JP50611 | Priority number, date | JP20180241064 | 25.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018241064 | [2021/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020138085 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903666 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, A61B5/00, G16H80/00, G01N33/49, G01N33/493, G01N33/74 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (US);
G01N29/022 (US);
G06N3/02 (US);
G16H80/00 (US);
G01N2800/108 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | A61B5/00, G16H50/20, G16H80/00, G01N33/49, G01N33/493, G01N33/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VORHERSAGE VON KRANKHEITEN | [2021/44] | English: | DISEASE PREDICTING SYSTEM | [2021/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉDICTION DE MALADIE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2021 | Translation filed | 24.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2007092433 (TETHYS BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-9 * page 5 par 3, page 21 par 3 and 4, page 28 line 5 - page 30 line 15, page 33 last par - page 35 par 1, claim 3 * [Y] 3; | [YA]US2018247020 (ITU LUCIAN MIHAI [RO], et al) [Y] 3 * par 120 *[A] 1,2,4-9 | International search | [Y]WO2007092433 (TETHYS BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9; | [A]JP2011508228 [A] 1-9; | [A]JP2018044877 (KEIO GIJUKU) [A] 1-9; | [Y]US2018247020 (ITU LUCIAN MIHAI [RO], et al) [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2008036068 |