EP3884509 - BI-STABLE TRIP UNIT WITH TRIP SOLENOID AND FLUX TRANSFER RESET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Boston One Campus 800 Federal Street Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTELSTADT, Chad R. 6829 Deer Horn Trl. NE Cedar Rapids, Iowa 52411 / US | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19905251.5 | 26.12.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019US68560 | Priority number, date | US201862785902P | 28.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862785902 P | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020139933 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884509 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/24, H01H71/00, H01H71/10, H01H71/12, H01H71/32, H01H71/66 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H01H71/24 (EP,US);
H01H50/18 (US);
H01H50/36 (US);
H01H71/66 (EP,US);
H01H71/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | BISTABILE AUSLÖSEEINHEIT MIT AUSLÖSEMAGNET UND FLUSSÜBERTRAGUNGSRÜCKSETZUNG | [2021/39] | English: | BI-STABLE TRIP UNIT WITH TRIP SOLENOID AND FLUX TRANSFER RESET | [2021/39] | French: | UNITÉ DE DÉCLENCHEMENT BISTABLE AVEC SOLÉNOÏDE DE DÉCLENCHEMENT ET RÉINITIALISATION DE TRANSFERT DE FLUX | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3098136 (STANBACK HARRIS I, et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US4623859 (ERICKSON KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2010156576 (BROGHAMMER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2012132506 (POTRATZ JASON [US]) [A] 1-15* entire document * | by applicant | US3098136 | US4623859 | US2010156576 | US2012132506 |