EP3903010 - SOLENOID LOW FRICTION BEARING LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 31500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNAMARA, Brian Kilrush Business Park Cooraclare Road Kilrush, V15NW27 / IE | 02 /
HUTCHESON, Ian D. Kilrush Business Park Cooraclare Road Kilrush, V15NW27 / IE | 03 /
BUSS, Gerard T. 89 Sebbins Pond Drive Bedford, New Hampshire 03110 / US | 04 /
RICH, David A. 8 Brick Manor Drive Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
MCNAMARA, Brian Kilrush, V15NW27 / IE | ||
02 /
HUTCHESON, Ian D. Kilrush, V15NW27 / IE | |||
03 /
BUSS, Gerard T. Bedford, New Hampshire 03110 / US | |||
04 /
RICH, David A. Nashua, New Hampshire 03063 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Leidescher, Thomas Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstraße 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19906198.7 | 18.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019US67018 | Priority number, date | US201862785488P | 27.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862785488 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020139640 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903010 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/12, F16C17/02, F16C33/20 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
F16C33/125 (EP);
F16C33/122 (KR,US);
F16C17/02 (EP);
F16C33/121 (EP);
F16C33/203 (EP);
F16C33/206 (KR);
H01F7/081 (EP,US);
H01F7/16 (US);
F16C2202/02 (EP);
F16C2208/30 (EP);
F16C2208/32 (EP,KR);
F16C2208/40 (EP);
F16C2208/42 (EP,KR);
F16C2208/44 (EP);
F16C2208/76 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | F16C33/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | REIBUNGSARME SOLENOIDLAGERAUSKLEIDUNG | [2021/44] | English: | SOLENOID LOW FRICTION BEARING LINER | [2021/44] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE ROULEMENT À FAIBLE FROTTEMENT POUR SOLÉNOÏDE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3902684 (SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLASTICS CORP [US]) [E] 1-14* figure 1; claims 1 - 9 * | International search | [A]US4518938 (BARTHOLOMAEUS REINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2005141797 (KINNO DAI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]KR20080012242 (MIBA GLEITLAGER GMBH [AT])[A] 1-15; | [YX]WO2012050929 (SAINT GOBAIN PERFORMANCE PLAST [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,7-11,15 [X] 2,4,6,12-14; | [Y]US2014170409 (BLACKMAN GREGORY SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,7-11,15 |