EP3896528 - ELECTRICAL PARAMETER DETECTION METHOD, CHIP, CONSUMABLE, IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhuhai Pantum Electronics Co., Ltd. 3A, Building 1 No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Zhuhai, Guangdong 519060 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hao 3A, Building 1 No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Zhuhai, Guangdong 519060 / CN | 02 /
YIN, Aiguo 3A, Building 1 No. 3883, Zhuhai Avenue Zhuhai, Guangdong 519060 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19906418.9 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN122618 | Priority number, date | CN201811642461 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811642461 | CN201910817052 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910817052 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020134901 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896528 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18, B41J2/175 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G03G21/1652 (EP,US);
G03G15/80 (EP,US);
B41J2/17546 (EP);
G03G15/0863 (EP);
G03G21/1619 (US);
G03G21/1671 (EP,US);
G03G21/1676 (EP,US);
G03G21/1875 (US);
G03G21/1878 (EP,CN);
G03G21/1892 (EP);
B41J29/02 (EP);
B41J29/13 (EP);
G03G2215/00632 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G03G21/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON ELEKTRISCHEN PARAMETERN, CHIP, VERBRAUCHSMATERIAL, BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | ELECTRICAL PARAMETER DETECTION METHOD, CHIP, CONSUMABLE, IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PARAMÈTRE ÉLECTRIQUE, PUCE, PRODUIT CONSOMMABLE, DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | Translation filed | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007126770 (ASAUCHI NOBORU [JP]); | [XAI]CN101887233 (APEX MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]US2012327155 (UCHIYAMA MASANOBU [JP]) |