EP3794444 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING DATA PROCESSED BY DATA PROCESSING ACCELERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu.com Times Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 2/F A2 Zhongguancun Software Park 17th Building No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Yueqiang 1195 Bordeaux Dr Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
LIU, Yong 1195 Bordeaux Dr Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
WEI, Tao 1195 Bordeaux Dr Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
OUYANG, Jian 2th Building No. 10, Xibeiwang East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19906905.5 | 04.01.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019CN70402 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020140261 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794444 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F21/57, G06F21/53, G06F21/62, // G06F21/70 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP);
G06F9/4411 (US);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06F9/3017 (US);
G06F9/3877 (US);
G06F9/545 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ VON DURCH DATENVERARBEITUNGSBESCHLEUNIGER VERARBEITETEN DATEN | [2021/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING DATA PROCESSED BY DATA PROCESSING ACCELERATORS | [2021/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR PROTÉGER DES DONNÉES TRAITÉES PAR DES ACCÉLÉRATEURS DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009025067 (HOLT ERIK [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0024] - [0027]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2014096132 (WANG CHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0016] - [0025]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2018053855 (MCAFEE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0045]; figures 1,2 *; | [I] - STAVROS VOLOS MICROSOFT RESEARCH KAPIL VASWANI MICROSOFT RESEARCH RODRIGO BRUNO INESC-ID / IST ET AL, "Graviton: Trusted Execution Environments on GPUs", (20181008), pages 688 - 703, USENIX, USENIX, THE ADVANCED COMPUTING SYSTEMS ASSOCIATION, URL: https://www.usenix.org/sites/default/files/osdi18_full_proceedings_interior.pdf, (20181008), XP061026302 [I] 1-9 * Figure 1, Section 2,4 and 5. * | International search | [A]US2015072726 (STERN ALLON JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0026]-[0054], figures 3-4 *; | [A]US2017337246 (CHANG CHIH-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US10031760 (SANTAN SONAL [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US2018307535 (SUZUKI AKIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2009025067 |