EP3876020 - OPTICAL IMAGING LENS AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change - representative | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JIANGXI LIANYI OPTICS CO., LTD. No. 1699 Jingdong Road Nanchang Hi-Tech Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xuming No. 1699, Jingdong Road, Nanchang Hi-Tech Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | 02 /
ZENG, Haojie No. 1699, Jingdong Road, Nanchang Hi-Tech Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Tian No. 1699, Jingdong Road, Nanchang Hi-Tech Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | 04 /
ZENG, Jiyong No. 1699, Jingdong Road, Nanchang Hi-Tech Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Chung, Hoi Kan Mandarin IP Limited 7 Cherry Trees Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5XA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | WAY-Insight Association c/o Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 19907109.3 | 07.11.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN116133 | Priority number, date | CN20191000729 | 02.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910000729 | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020140604 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876020 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/18, G02B9/64, // H04M1/02, H04N5/225 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G02B9/64 (EP,US);
G02B13/0045 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/0264 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04M2250/52 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE BILDGEBUNGSLINSE UND BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/36] | English: | OPTICAL IMAGING LENS AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2021/36] | French: | LENTILLE D'IMAGERIE OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2021 | Translation filed | 03.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6360958B (AAC TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP6363782B (AAC TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP6377234B (AAC TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]US10133036 (WANG JIANMING [CN], et al) [X] 1,5-8,13-15 * tables 1, 2 * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 7 * * column 5, lines 9, 16 * [I] 2-4,9-12; | [XI]US10139598 (WANG JIANMING [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,13-15 * tables 1, 2 * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 7 * * column 5, lines 7, 15 * [I] 4,5,9-12; | [P]US10228541 (SHI RONGBAO [CN], et al); | [P]US2019121088 (SHI RONGBAO [CN], et al); | [P]US2019121086 (SHI RONGBAO [CN], et al) |