EP3906554 - CONFIGURABLE DATA PATH FOR MEMORY MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINSLEY, Thomas, H. c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
KINSLEY, Thomas, H. Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 19907408.9 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/45] | WO2019US66635 | Priority number, date | US201862787039P | 31.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862787039 P | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020142190 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906554 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3906554 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10, G11C29/42, G06F11/10 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G06F13/1668 (EP,KR,US);
G11C29/42 (KR);
G06F11/1004 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/1048 (EP,KR);
G06F11/1068 (US);
G11C11/406 (US);
G11C11/4076 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/4093 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/4096 (EP,KR);
G11C29/4401 (EP,KR);
G11C29/52 (EP,KR);
G11C29/72 (EP,KR);
G11C7/1009 (EP,KR);
G11C7/1045 (EP,KR);
G11C11/40622 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | G11C7/10, G11C29/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARER DATENPFAD FÜR SPEICHERMODULE | [2021/45] | English: | CONFIGURABLE DATA PATH FOR MEMORY MODULES | [2021/45] | French: | CHEMIN DE DONNÉES CONFIGURABLE POUR MODULES DE MÉMOIRE | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24181782.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6681301 (MEHTA PRATIK M [US], et al); | [Y]US2016034340 (DONO CHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2017337125 (LEE HYUN [US], et al); | [XA]US2018144786 (LIM SUN-YOUNG [KR], et al) | International search | [AX]US6681301 (MEHTA PRATIK M [US], et al); | [A]US2006267172 (NGUYEN HENRY H [US], et al); | [Y]US2013182522 (LIM YOUNG-IL [KR], et al); | [Y]US2016034340 (DONO CHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2018285013 (RAJAN SURESH [US], et al) |