EP3910033 - AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kansai Paint Co., Ltd. 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-8555 / JP | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Kansai Paint Co., Ltd 33-1, Kanzaki-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Mika c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 17-1, Higashi-Yawata, 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | 02 /
KEICHO, Kazuaki c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 17-1, Higashi-Yawata, 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | 03 /
AMAKI, Shingo c/o KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 17-1, Higashi-Yawata, 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Mika Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | ||
02 /
KEICHO, Kazuaki Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | |||
03 /
AMAKI, Shingo Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19908753.7 | 25.12.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019JP51041 | Priority number, date | JP20190000925 | 08.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019000925 | [2021/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145171 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910033 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3910033 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3910033 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C08L23/00, C08L67/00, C09D123/14, C09D167/00, C09D7/63 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C09D123/10 (EP,US);
C09D123/14 (KR);
B65D25/14 (US);
C08K5/20 (US);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C09D167/00 (KR);
C09D167/02 (US);
C09D5/02 (EP,KR);
C09D5/08 (EP,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,KR);
C08L2201/54 (EP);
C08L2312/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D123/10, C08K5/20, C08L23/0869, C08L51/06, C08L67/02 (EP);
C09D123/10, C08K5/29, C08L23/0869, C08L51/06, C08L67/02 (EP);
C09D123/10, C08K5/35, C08L23/0869, C08L51/06, C08L67/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/46] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING MATERIAL COMPOSITION | [2021/46] | French: | COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2021 | Translation filed | 08.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.12.2023 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | MC | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SK | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1186643 (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM LLC [US]); | [X]US2014141268 (WILBUR JEFFREY [US], et al); | [X]WO2015069502 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) | International search | [A]US2010143628 (CHOUDHERY RIAZ AHMAD [GB], et al); | [Y]US2013149453 (ROMICK JAY D [US], et al); | [XY]JP2015229710 (UNITIKA LTD); | [A]JP2016148006 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]WO2018207891 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2005120306 | JP2005179491 | JP2016501291 | JP2016113561 | JP2019000925 |