EP3886486 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Zhihua No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Wenhong No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
FANG, Yun No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Yingpei No.18 Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19908844.4 | 11.01.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019CN71454 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143048 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886486 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W52/26, H04W52/14 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04W52/365 (EP);
H04W52/18 (US);
H04L5/0025 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W52/42 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | H04W24/10, H04W52/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/39] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2021 | Translation filed | 24.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018115957 (LIN KO-CHIANG [TW], et al); | International search | [X]CN102083129 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO); | [X]CN102300249 ; | [A]CN102547954 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN108112065 (ZTE CORP) |