EP3878096 - CALIBRATION OF BONE CONDUCTION TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook Technologies, LLC. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWERS, Peter Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
KHALEGHIMEYBODI, Morteza Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
GOTTLIEB, Peter Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Antonio, John Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
DAGDAGAN, Jack, Yahkub Facebook Technologies, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19910581.8 | 16.01.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019US13858 | Priority number, date | US201916248674 | 15.01.2019 Original published format: US201916248674 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020149843 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878096 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03G5/16, H04R3/00, H04R1/10, H04R3/04, H04R5/033 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04R3/04 (EP,US);
H03G5/165 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/1008 (US);
H04R1/1016 (KR);
H04R1/1041 (US);
H04R23/02 (US);
H04R29/001 (US);
H04R3/00 (KR);
H04R5/033 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H03G5/16, H04R3/00, H04R1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERUNG EINER KNOCHENLEITUNGSWANDLERANORDNUNG | [2021/37] | English: | CALIBRATION OF BONE CONDUCTION TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY | [2021/37] | French: | ÉTALONNAGE D'ENSEMBLE TRANSDUCTEUR DE CONDUCTION OSSEUSE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 07.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014363002 (KUPERSHMIDT HAIM [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1, 3-6 *; | [A]US9020168 (KARKKAINEN LEO [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0073]; figures 2-3 *; | [A]JP2015179945 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1, 6 *; | [A]WO2017189876 (GERBER DANIELLE EVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2A, 5B * | International search | [A]US2011224481 (LEE SHIO-SHIIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-34* See paragraphs [0074]-[0082] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2013051585 (KARKKAINEN LEO [FI], et al) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0034] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2014185819 (GLEISSNER ACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0044] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]KR101724050B (ROH GEUN HO [KR]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0063] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2017318379 (BULLEN STEFAN BISITS [AU], et al) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0080] and figures 1A-7D. * | by applicant | US2014363002 | US9020168 | JP2015179945 | WO2017189876 |