EP3915859 - AUTOMOTIVE FRAME PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/48] | AUTOMOTIVE FRAME COMPONENT | ||
[2024/27] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - German title | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - English title | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - French title | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGAI, Kazuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
SHIOZAKI, Tsuyoshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
HIGAI, Kazuhiko Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIOZAKI, Tsuyoshi Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 19911319.2 | 06.09.2019 | [2021/48] | WO2019JP35188 | Priority number, date | JP20190009075 | 23.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019009075 | [2021/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020152904 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915859 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915859 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/00, B62D21/15, B62D25/20, B62D29/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B62D29/005 (EP,US);
B62D25/04 (KR,US);
B62D25/00 (EP);
B62D25/06 (KR);
B62D25/20 (KR,US);
B62D29/002 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | B62D25/04, B62D25/06, B62D25/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUGRAHMENTEIL | [2024/27] | English: | AUTOMOTIVE FRAME PART | [2024/27] | French: | PARTIE DE CHÂSSIS D'AUTOMOBILE | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/48] | RAHMENKOMPONENTE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2021/48] | AUTOMOTIVE FRAME COMPONENT | ||
Former [2021/48] | COMPOSANT DE CHÂSSIS D'AUTOMOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2021 | Translation filed | 15.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 04.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1074457 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [X]JP2001048052 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]JP2001088740 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2003226261 (KYOWA SANGYO, et al); | [A]EP1387789 (L & L PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [A]US2013106138 (BROCKHOFF FRANZ ULRICH [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2001048054 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JP2003226261 (KYOWA SANGYO, et al); | [Y]JP2018144529 (JFE STEEL CORP) | Examination | WO03000535 | EP1387789 | by applicant | JP2000318075 | JP2006240134 |