EP3914290 - ANTI-ELASTIN ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clemson University Research Foundation Post Office Box 946 Clemson, SC 29633-0946 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VYAVAHARE, Narendra R. c/o Clemson University 230 Kappa St. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | 02 /
RICE, Charles D. c/o Clemson University 230 Kappa St. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | 03 /
NOSOUDI, Nasim c/o Clemson University 230 Kappa St. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | 04 /
PARASARAM, Vaideesh c/o Clemson University 230 Kappa St. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | 05 /
KARAMCHED, Saketh c/o Clemson University 230 Kappa St. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
VYAVAHARE, Narendra R. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | ||
02 /
RICE, Charles D. Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | |||
03 /
NOSOUDI, Nasim Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | |||
04 /
PARASARAM, Vaideesh Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | |||
05 /
KARAMCHED, Saketh Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 19911987.6 | 22.01.2019 | [2021/48] | WO2019US14537 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153940 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3914290 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61K47/69, A61K49/00, C07K16/18, G01N33/68 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP);
A61K38/48 (IL);
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (IL);
A61K47/6843 (EP,US);
A61K47/6929 (EP);
A61K47/6937 (EP);
A61K49/0032 (EP);
A61K49/0058 (EP,US);
A61K49/0093 (EP);
A61K51/00 (IL,KR);
C12N5/16 (IL);
G01N33/53 (IL);
G01N33/54346 (KR);
A01K2207/10 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0375 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | A61K39/00, A61K51/00, A61K38/48, C12P21/08, C12N5/16, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | ANTI-ELASTIN-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2021/48] | English: | ANTI-ELASTIN ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE | [2021/48] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-ÉLASTINE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012045781 (VEIDAL SANNE S [DK], et al); | [A]US2014017263 (VYAVAHARE NAREN [US], et al); | [I]WO2015104342 (NORDIC BIOSCIENCE AS [DK]); | International search | [A]US2009104215 (EKIEL IRENA [CA], et al); | [YA]US2011129531 (COLLETTE ADAM L [US], et al); | [A]US2014086921 (GRISWOLD-PRENNER IRENE [US], et al); | [A]US2014193420 (ABURATANI HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015344548 (SIMARD JOHN [US]); | [YA]US2017002047 (JIMENEZ FELIPE [US], et al); | [A]US2017015742 (GU JIJIE [US], et al); | [A]US2017275376 (IGAWA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); |