EP3917900 - PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC AND OLEFINIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONANT, Travis SABIC Technology Center, 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 02 /
FICKEL, Dustin SABIC Technology Center, 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 03 /
VELASCO PELAEZ, Raul SABIC Technology Center, 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 04 /
SCHROER, Joseph William SABIC Technology Center, 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
CONANT, Travis Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | ||
02 /
FICKEL, Dustin Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | |||
03 /
VELASCO PELAEZ, Raul Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | |||
04 /
SCHROER, Joseph William Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19912621.0 | 31.01.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019US16039 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159512 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917900 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/41, C07C15/06, C07C15/08, C07C15/04, C07C4/04, C07C11/04, C07C11/06, C10G63/04, C10G69/00, C10G69/06, C10G69/10, C10G69/08 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C10G63/04 (EP);
C07C2/66 (US);
C07C4/025 (US);
C07C4/04 (EP);
C07C5/41 (EP,US);
C10G69/00 (EP);
C10G69/06 (EP);
C10G69/08 (EP);
C10G69/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C4/04, C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C4/04, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C5/41, C07C15/04 (EP);
C07C5/41, C07C15/06 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/49] | C07C2/66, C07C5/41, C10G47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AROMATISCHEN UND OLEFINISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/49] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC AND OLEFINIC COMPOUNDS | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉS AROMATIQUES ET OLÉFINIQUES | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]US4594145 (ROARTY JOHN C [US]) [Y] 8/(1-6) * col 3, In 43-50; col 4, In 1-7; col 5, In 5-12 * [A] 9-12; | [A]US5292976 (DESSAU RALPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * whole document *; | [A]WO9858041 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * whole document *; | [XYA]US5932777 (SUGHRUE II EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 13, 17-19 * col 2, In 4-27; col 3, In 32-33; col 3, In 45-47; col 11, In 30-36; col 12, In 1-29; col 13, In 23-27; col 14, In 20-42; col 15, In 6667; col 16, In 32-39; Table I-III * [Y] 8/(1-6) [A] 7, 8/7, 9-12, 14-16; | [A]US6190534 (BOGDAN PAULA L [US]) [A] 1-19 * whole document *; | [A]US2017144948 (STEVENSON SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * whole document *; | [A]US2018327676 (DONGARA RAJESHWER [IN], et al) [A] 1-19* whole document * |