EP3919787 - LOW-TORQUE WATER SHUTOFF-TYPE LINE STOPPING VALVE USING STEPWISE PRESSURE POINT SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Jae Hyun A-703, 67, Ttukseom-ro 34-gil Gwangjin-gu Seoul 05096 / KR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Hyun Bae 201, 17, Deongneung-ro 59ra-gil Dobong-gu Seoul 01469 / KR | 02 /
GU, Dong Ryul B-102, 30, Hanil-ro 15beon-gil, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17099 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jae Hyun A-703, 67, Ttukseom-ro 34-gil Gwangjin-gu Seoul 05096 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
HONG, Hyun Bae Seoul 01469 / KR | ||
02 /
GU, Dong Ryul Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17099 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Jae Hyun Seoul 05096 / KR | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19912868.7 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019KR10549 | Priority number, date | KR20190013151 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190013151 | [2021/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159023 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919787 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/314, F16K3/28, F16K27/04, F16K3/02 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
F16K3/0272 (EP);
F16K3/314 (EP,KR);
F16K27/04 (KR);
F16K3/0227 (EP);
F16K3/0263 (EP);
F16K3/0281 (EP);
F16K3/28 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | F16K3/314, F16K3/28, F16K27/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | WASSERABSPERRVENTIL MIT NIEDRIGEM DREHMOMENT UND STUFENWEISER DRUCKPUNKTUNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2021/49] | English: | LOW-TORQUE WATER SHUTOFF-TYPE LINE STOPPING VALVE USING STEPWISE PRESSURE POINT SUPPORT | [2021/49] | French: | VANNE D'ARRÊT DE LIGNE DU TYPE À COUPURE D'EAU À FAIBLE COUPLE UTILISANT UN SUPPORT DE POINT DE PRESSION PAS À PAS | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2021 | Translation filed | 27.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59147169 (MARUMAN KOGYO) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]KR101157077B (KIM JAE HYUN [KR]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]KR20120111355 (DONG HWA CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS59147169 (MARUMAN KOGYO) [Y] 2-5 * See claims 1-2 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]KR101067247B (JINWON DEV CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * See claim 2 and figures 1-4. *; | [XY]KR101157077B (KIM JAE HYUN [KR]) [X] 1 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0026], claim 1 and figures la-lb, 2-6. * [Y] 2-5; | [A]KR101620049B (LEE JO EUN [KR]) [A] 1-5 * See claims 1-3 and figures 1a-1b, 2-8. *; | [A]EP3321550 (VALVULAS ARCO S L [ES]) [A] 1-5* See paragraphs [0020]-[0023] and figures 1-7. * | by applicant | KR980005477 | KR101067247B | KR101157077B | KR101577777B | KR101839729B |