EP3905815 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Ruixiang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yuan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
MA, Ruixiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
GUAN, Lei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Yuan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19913179.8 | 30.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019CN129992 | Priority number, date | CN20191080414 | 28.01.2019 Original published format: CN201910080414 | [2021/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156002 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905815 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L1/18 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04L1/0004 (US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/1812 (CN);
H04L1/1819 (US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1887 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L25/0226 (US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04W72/0446 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/44] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2021/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2021 | Translation filed | 29.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 18.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013163533 (ANDERSON NICHOLAS WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0374] - [0391] * [I] 3,4,10,11; | [XI]US2015304074 (SEO DONGYOUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0122] - [0139] * [I] 3,4,10,11; | [XI]US2017302424 (SEO DONGYOUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0105] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0110] * * paragraphs [0182] - [0187] * [I] 3,4,10,11; | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Summary of 7.2.2 Study of necessity of a new DCI format", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180301), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1803413, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180301), XP051398635 [X] 1,2,5-9,12-15 * pages 1-4 * [I] 3,4,10,11 |