EP3812318 - MATERIAL INTEGRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elegant Home-Tech Co., Ltd. Hexing Street, Jinfeng Town Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215626 / CN | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Zhangjiagang Elegant Home-Tech Co., Ltd. Hexing Street, Jinfeng Town Zhangjiagang Jiangsu 215626 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Jincheng Hexing Street, Jinfeng Town Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215626 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19914185.4 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN115551 | Priority number, date | CN201910762857 | 19.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910762857 | [2021/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021031361 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812318 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3812318 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/05, B65G61/00, B65G47/91, B65B35/18, B65G47/24, B65G47/26, B65G49/06 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B65G47/24 (EP,US);
B65G49/06 (CN);
B65G49/067 (EP,CN,US);
B65G47/26 (EP);
B65G47/914 (EP,US);
B65G49/061 (CN,US);
B65G49/064 (EP,US);
B65G49/068 (EP);
B65G2249/04 (EP,US);
B65G2249/045 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | B65G49/05, B65G61/00, B65G47/91, B65B35/18, B65G47/24, B65G47/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIALINTEGRATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/17] | English: | MATERIAL INTEGRATION DEVICE | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTÉGRATION DE MATÉRIAU | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2020 | Translation filed | 12.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 27.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN103863818 (PENG FUGUO) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0059]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN106695616 (DONGGUAN RBT IND ROBOT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |