EP3922292 - CATHETER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100, Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINO Yusuke c/o ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | 02 /
YAGI Takayuki c/o ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
HOSHINO Yusuke Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | ||
02 /
YAGI Takayuki Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 19914494.0 | 06.02.2019 | [2021/50] | WO2019JP04163 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161811 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922292 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US);
A61M25/0009 (EP);
A61M2025/0059 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (US);
A61M25/0069 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | KATHETER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KATHETERS | [2021/50] | English: | CATHETER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CATHETER | [2021/50] | French: | CATHÉTER ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CATHÉTER | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | Translation filed | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0530970 (COOK INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * column 4, line 6 - line 27; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,6,7; | [A]EP2174685 (ASAHI INTECC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2016196177 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-8* figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]JP2000000309 (ASAHI INTECC CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0009], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006223728 (PIOLAX MEDICAL DEVICE KK) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0005]-[0016], [0032]-[0036], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2014276643 (GUO XIAOPING [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0067], fig. 5 & US 2018/0256787 A1 *; | [A]JP2018526185 (CATHERA, INC.) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0006], [0011], [0018], [0020], [0035], fig. 1A-1B, 3 & WO 2017/044129 A1, paragraphs [0014], [0019], [0026], [0028], [0043], fig. 1A-1B, 3 & CN 108348726 A * | by applicant | JP2016174829 |