EP3922975 - ODOR SEARCH METHOD AND ODOR SEARCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aroma Bit, Inc. Sagami Building 2nd Floor 7-13-6 Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKI, Shunichiro c/o AROMA BIT, Inc., Sagami Building 2nd Floor, 7- 13-6, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 02 /
HASHIZUME, Kenichi c/o AROMA BIT, Inc., Sagami Building 2nd Floor, 7- 13-6, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 03 /
TERADA, Erika c/o AROMA BIT, Inc., Sagami Building 2nd Floor, 7- 13-6, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Megumi c/o AROMA BIT, Inc., Sagami Building 2nd Floor, 7- 13-6, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 05 /
AIZAWA, Shingo c/o AROMA BIT, Inc., Sagami Building 2nd Floor, 7- 13-6, Ginza, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
KUROKI, Shunichiro Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
HASHIZUME, Kenichi Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
TERADA, Erika Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAHASHI, Megumi Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | |||
05 /
AIZAWA, Shingo Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 19914643.2 | 08.02.2019 | [2021/50] | WO2019JP04746 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020161917 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922975 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/036, G01N29/02, G01N29/44, G01N33/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/0034 (EP);
G01N33/0001 (US);
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
G01N29/036 (EP);
G01N29/4454 (EP,US);
G01N29/449 (EP);
G01N2291/0255 (EP);
G01N2291/0256 (EP);
G01N2291/0423 (EP);
G01N2291/0426 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | G01N5/02, G01N27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | GERUCHSSUCHVERFAHREN UND GERUCHSSUCHSYSTEM | [2021/50] | English: | ODOR SEARCH METHOD AND ODOR SEARCH SYSTEM | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECHERCHE D'ODEUR ET SYSTÈME DE RECHERCHE D'ODEUR | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | Translation filed | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5177994 (MORIIZUMI TOYOSAKA [JP], et al); | [XY]US5675070 (GELPERIN ALAN [US]); | [Y]US2003172717 (KITA JUN-ICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2003275289 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP); | [Y]US2005160789 (FREYER ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010300180 (BOSI GILDO [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2018211642 (AROMA BIT INC [JP]); | [XY]WO2018235148 (AROMA BIT INC [JP]); | International search | [YA]JP2003275289 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [Y] 1-3, 6-9 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0045], fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) * [A] 4-5; | [A]JP2003315298 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 6-8* , paragraph [0030] & US 2003/0172717 A1, paragraph [0061] & EP 1336844 A2 & CN 1439876 A & KR 10-0570105 B1 *; | [A]US2005160789 (FREYER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * , paraaraphs GAMMA00511-GAMMA01231 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008308649 (UNIV KYUSHU, et al) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0030]-[0051] (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2016031080 (KABUSHIKIGAISHA AROMA BIT INC [JP]) [Y] 1-3, 6-9 * , paragraphs [0055], [0078][0084] & US 2017/0199159 A1, paragraphs [0091], [0133]-[0140] & EP 3187852 A1 & CN 106662517 A * | by applicant | JPH05187986 |