EP3925425 - AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUBOTA CORPORATION 1-2-47 Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKUBO, Takuya c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 02 /
MIYAKE, Hiroshi c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
NISHIKUBO, Takuya Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAKE, Hiroshi Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 19915213.3 | 20.11.2019 | [2021/51] | WO2019JP45476 | Priority number, date | JP20190024624 | 14.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019024624 | [2021/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020166164 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925425 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3925425 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/00, B62D49/00, B62D49/06, G05D1/00, G01S7/481, G01S7/521, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, G08G1/16 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G05D1/024 (EP);
A01B69/008 (US);
A01B69/001 (EP);
B62D49/00 (EP);
B62D49/0628 (EP);
G01S15/93 (EP);
G01S17/93 (EP);
G01S7/481 (EP);
G01S7/521 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/228 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | B62D49/00, A01B69/00, B62D49/06, G05D1/02, G01S7/481, G01S7/521, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, G08G1/16 | ||
Former IPC [2021/51] | A01B69/00, B62D49/00, G01S15/93, G01S17/93, G08G1/16, G01S7/481, G01S7/521 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE | [2021/51] | English: | AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY | [2021/51] | French: | MACHINE AGRICOLE | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2021 | Translation filed | 02.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63185760U ; | [A]JPH01173110 (KUBOTA LTD); | [A]JPH0534593U ; | [A]JPH0617410U ; | [Y]JPH11153442 (HITACHI LTD); | [XY]WO2018135256 (KUBOTA KK [JP]); | [XY]WO2018135257 (KUBOTA KK [JP]); | [XY]CN208013430U (UNIV NANJING AGRICULTURAL); | [XY]JP2018185236 (KUBOTA KK); | EP3572897 [ ] (KUBOTA KK [JP]); | EP3572302 [ ] (KUBOTA KK [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS63185760U ; | [A]JPH01173110 (KUBOTA LTD); | [A]JPH0534593U ; | [A]JPH0617410U ; | [A]JPH11153442 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]CN208013430U (UNIV NANJING AGRICULTURAL); | [Y]JP2018185236 (KUBOTA KK) | by applicant | JP2018174890 |