EP3928630 - TASTE MAINTENANCE METHOD FOR ICE CREAM MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hubei Guangshen Electric Produce Co., Ltd. Xian'an Economic Development Zone Xianning Hubei 437000 / CN | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinbing Hubei Guangshen Electric Produce Co., Ltd. Xian' an Economic Development Zone Xianning, Hubei 437000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
WANG, Xinbing Xianning, Hubei 437000 / CN | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 19915755.3 | 04.04.2019 | [2021/52] | WO2019CN81477 | Priority number, date | CN201910129103 | 21.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910129103 | [2021/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020168621 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928630 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/08, A23G9/28, A23G9/16, A23G9/12, A23G9/22, G05B19/042 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
A23G9/228 (EP,US);
A23G9/12 (EP,US);
A23G9/16 (EP);
A23G9/281 (EP);
G05B2219/2654 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | A23G9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GESCHMACKSBEWAHRUNG FÜR SPEISEEISMASCHINE | [2021/52] | English: | TASTE MAINTENANCE METHOD FOR ICE CREAM MACHINE | [2021/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONSERVATION DU GOÛT POUR MACHINE À CRÈME GLACÉE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2021 | Translation filed | 11.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3042570 (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA [IT]); | [I]US2017188600 (SEMO SCHARFMAN LAURA ROSE [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017177417 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) | International search | [A]CN101843285 (YONGXIONG LI) [A] 1-10* see entire document *; | [A]CN106595115 (CARPIGIANI GROUP - ALI S P A) [A] 1-10 * see entire document *; | [Y]CN106819340 (YANG SHIJIA) [Y] 2, 4, 6, 8 * claim 1, and description, paragraphs 0008 and 0011 *; | [A]CN108208301 (HUANGSHI DONGBEI REFRIGERATION CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * see entire document *; | [X]CN109152384 (NESTEC SA) [X] 1-3, 5, 7, 9, 10 * claim 1, and description, paragraphs 0043 and 0044 *; | [Y]CN109152384 (NESTEC SA) [Y] 2, 4, 6, 8 * claim 1, and description, paragraphs 0043 and 0044 * |