EP3932290 - MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, PROCESSOR DEVICE, ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM, MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOSAKE, Masaaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 02 /
KAMON, Shumpei c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
OOSAKE, Masaaki Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMON, Shumpei Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | Representative(s) | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 19916810.5 | 25.10.2019 | [2022/01] | WO2019JP41947 | Priority number, date | JP20190032944 | 26.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019032944 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020174747 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932290 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3932290 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24, G06F3/14, G06T11/00, G06V10/25, G06V10/82 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/00045 (US);
A61B1/0005 (EP);
G02B23/24 (EP);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06T2207/10068 (US);
G06T2207/30004 (US);
G06V2201/03 (US);
G06V2201/031 (EP);
G09G2340/12 (EP);
G09G2380/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | A61B1/045, G02B23/24, A61B1/00, G06F3/14, G06T11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/01] | A61B1/045, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER, PROZESSOR, ENDOSKOPSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG MEDIZINISCHER BILDER UND PROGRAMM | [2022/01] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, PROCESSOR DEVICE, ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM, MEDICAL IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE MÉDICALE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT, SYSTÈME D'ENDOSCOPE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2021 | Translation filed | 02.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 08.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | LU | 25.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007209770 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0129] * * figures 1-12 *; | [A]WO2018179991 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018221033 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 1-16; claims 1-43 *; | [A]WO2018235246 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2019003597 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0050] * * claims 1-17 * | International search | [A]US2016171708 (KIM WON SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-19 * , paragraph [0090], fig. 5A-5B & EP 3032445 A2 & KR 10-2016-0071241 A & CN 105701331 A *; | [A]WO2017057574 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0090], [0094], [0131]-[0133], fig. 5, 7, 17, 18 & US 2018/0214005 A1, paragraphs [0112], [0116], [0153]-[0155], fig. 5, 7, 17, 18 & EP 3357406 A1 *; | [A]WO2017073338 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2018/0242817 A1, entire text, all drawings & EP 3357407 A1 & CN 108135457 A *; | [A]WO2018235246 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0105]-[0140], fig. 2, 4-10 (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2019088121 (JAPANESE FOUND FOR CANCER RES [JP], et al) [PA] 1-19* , entire text, all drawings & TW 201922174 A * | by applicant | JP4451460B | JP5658873B | JP6176978B |