EP3925611 - RADIOSENSITIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.T.3, Inc. 3-20-2 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | For all designated states Nihon University 8-24 Kudan-minami 4-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8275 / JP | For all designated states School Corporation, Azabu Veterinary Medicine Educational Institution 1-17-71, Fuchinobe Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5201 / JP | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHARA, Hiroeki c/o AZABU University, 1-17-71 Fuchinobe, Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5201 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Tomohiro c/o NIHON University, 8-24, Kudan-minami 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8275 / JP | 03 /
MARUO, Takuya c/o AZABU University, 1-17-71 Fuchinobe, Chuo-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5201 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
SAHARA, Hiroeki Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5201 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAYAMA, Tomohiro Tokyo 102-8275 / JP | |||
03 /
MARUO, Takuya Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5201 / JP | Representative(s) | Drywood, Rosalind Aerona, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 19918427.6 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/51] | WO2019JP41730 | Priority number, date | JP20190039749 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019039749 | [2021/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020179125 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925611 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7028, A61K41/00, A61P35/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61K41/0038 (EP);
A61K31/7032 (US);
A61K31/7028 (EP);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | RADIOSENSIBILISATOR | [2021/51] | English: | RADIOSENSITIZER | [2021/51] | French: | RADIOSENSIBILISATEUR | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2021 | Translation filed | 14.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2130834 (TOYO SUISAN KAISHA [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0108] * [Y] 1-9; | [XY] - YOICHI TAKAKUSAGI ET AL, "A Multimodal Molecular Imaging Study Evaluates Pharmacological Alteration of the Tumor Microenvironment to Improve Radiation Response", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20181215), vol. 78, no. 24, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-18-1654, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6828 - 6837, XP055735704 [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 6829, column r, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-18-1654 | [XY] - YUGO SAWADA ET AL, "Sulfoquinovosylacylpropanediol is a novel potent radiosensitizer in prostate cancer", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, JP, (20150317), vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1111/iju.12753, ISSN 0919-8172, pages 590 - 595, XP055735708 [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 590, abstract * * page 591, right-hand column, Treatments * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/iju.12753 | [XY] - SAKIMOTO IPPEI ET AL, "alpha-sulfoquinovosylmonoacylglycerol is a novel potent radiosensitizer targeting tumor angiogenesis", CANCER RESEARCH, (200602), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2287 - 2295, XP002805785 [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 2292, column r * * page 2292, column l * [Y] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-2209 | [XY] - OHTA KEISUKE ET AL, "Remodeling of the Tumor Microenvironment by Combined Treatment with a Novel Radiosensitizer, alpha-Sulfoquinovosylmonoacylglycerol (alpha-SQMG) and X-irradiation", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (201011), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 4397 - 4404, XP002805786 [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 4398, left-hand column, Treatments * [Y] 1-9 | International search | [A]WO2006001374 (TOYO SUISAN KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10; | [XA]WO2009014101 (TOYO SUISAN KAISHA [JP], et al) [X] 4-9 [A] 1-3, 10; | [A]WO2010082634 (TOYO SUISAN KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2016150905 (UNIV OF SCIENCE TOKYO) [A] 1-10; | [XA] - Yoichi Takakusagi, Sarwat Naz, Kaori Takakusagi, Masahiro Ishima, Hiroshi Murata, Keisuke Ohta, Masahiko Miura, Fumio Sugawara, Kengo Sakaguchi, Shun Kishimoto, Jeeva P. Munasinghe, James B. Mitchell and Murali C. Krishna, "A Multimodal Molecular Imaging Study Evaluates Pharmacological Alteration of the Tumor Microenvironment to Improve Radiation Response", Cancer Research, (20181215), vol. 78, no. 24, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-18-1654, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6828 - 6837, XP055735704 [X] 4-9 * Abstract, Fig. 1, of SQAP on tumor radiotherapy XR Abstract, Fig. 1, of SQAP on tumor * [A] 1-3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-18-1654 | [XA] - Yugo Sawada Kazuya Omoto Naoki Kohei Kengo Sakaguchi Masahiko Miura Kazunari Tanabe, "Sulfoquinovosylacylpropanediol is a novel potent radiosensitizer in prostate cancer", International Journal of Urology, (20150317), vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1111/iju.12753, ISSN 0919-8172, pages 590 - 595, XP055735708 [X] 4-9 * Abstract, Fig. 2 Abstract, Fig. 2 * [A] 1-3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/iju.12753 | [XA] - Jesus Izaguirre-Carbonell, Hirofumi Kawakubo, Hiroshi Murata, Atsushi Tanabe, Toshifumi Takeuchi, Tomoe Kusayanagi, Senko Tsukuda, Takeshi Hirakawa, Kazuki Iwabata, Yoshihiro Kanai, Keisuke Ohta, Masahiko Miura, Kengo Sakaguchi, Sachihiro Matsunaga, Hiroeki Sahara, Shinji Kamisuki , Fumio Sugawara, "Novel anticancer agent, SQAP, binds to focal adhesion kinase and modulates its activity", Scientific Reports, (20151012), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep15136, ISSN 2045-2322, pages 1 - 13, XP055735711 [X] 4, 5-9 * Supplementary Fig. S1 Supplementary Fig. S1 * [A] 1-3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep15136 | [A] - Hideki Iwamoto, Nakamura Toru, Koga Hironori, Izaguirre-Carbonell Jesus, Kamisuki Shinji, Sugawara Fumio, Abe Mitsuhiko, Iwabata Kazuki, Ikezono Yu, Sakaue Takahiko, Masuda Atsutaka, Yano Hirohisa, Ohta Keisuke, Nakano Masahito, Shimose Shigeo, Shirono Tomotake, Torimura Takuji, "Inhibition of hypoxia-inducible factor via upregulatiuon of von Hippel-Lindau protein induces ''angiogenic switch off'' in a hepatoma mouse mode", Molecular Therapy - Oncolytics, (20150101), vol. 2, doi:10.1038/mto.2015.20, ISSN 2372-7705, pages 1 - 11, XP055735716 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mto.2015.20 | by applicant | JP2002536341 | JP2007302609 | WO2009014101 | JP2019039749 |