EP3940847 - LAMINATED BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA Kazuyoshi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KOGA Eiichi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
KAWASE Akira Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
MASUDA Noboru Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YAMASAKI Takeshi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 19919400.2 | 13.11.2019 | [2022/03] | WO2019JP44536 | Priority number, date | JP20190045153 | 12.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019045153 | [2022/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020183794 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940847 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0562, H01M10/0585, H01M50/531 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0585 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0562 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0071 (US);
H01M50/533 (EP,US);
H01M50/534 (EP,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | H01M10/0562, H01M10/0585, H01M2/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | LAMINIERTE BATTERIE | [2022/03] | English: | LAMINATED BATTERY | [2022/03] | French: | BATTERIE STRATIFIÉE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | Translation filed | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016043375 (SAITOH TOMOKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2018123196 (HASEGAWA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018123115 (KATO MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2010055811 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-5, 7-9, 11-12; | [X]WO2015031365 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-5, 11; | [A]JP2017199662 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP)[A] 10; | [A]JP2018106940 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD) [A] 6 | by applicant | JP2013097907 | JP2014116156 | JP2015153663 |