EP3939222 - TRACKING IMAGE SENDERS ON CLIENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems, Inc. 851 West Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shuzhen c/o Citrix Nanjing, C3 Building, No. 19 Suyuan Avenue, Jiangning District Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | 02 /
XU, Sai c/o Citrix Nanjing, C3 Building, No. 19 Suyuan Avenue, Jiangning District Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
LI, Shuzhen Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | ||
02 /
XU, Sai Nanjing, Jiangsu 211100 / CN | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 19919531.4 | 12.03.2019 | [2022/03] | WO2019CN77867 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020181500 | Date: | 17.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939222 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, H04L41/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04N1/32149 (EP,US);
G06T1/0021 (US);
G06T1/0028 (US);
G06T1/005 (EP,US);
G06T1/0078 (US);
H04L43/028 (EP);
H04L43/20 (EP);
G06T2201/0052 (EP);
G06T2201/0061 (EP);
G06T2201/0065 (EP);
G06T2201/0083 (EP);
H04L41/046 (EP);
H04L41/0894 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | H04L29/00, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG VON BILDSENDERN AUF CLIENT-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/03] | English: | TRACKING IMAGE SENDERS ON CLIENT DEVICES | [2022/03] | French: | SUIVI D'EXPÉDITEURS D'IMAGE SUR DES DISPOSITIFS CLIENTS | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005025338 (ZHAO JIAN [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0045] - [0046] - [0074] - [0098] *; | [I] - SINGH PRIYANKA ET AL, "A multimodal biometric watermarking system for digital images in redundant discrete wavelet transform", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, vol. 76, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S11042-016-4048-0, ISSN 1380-7501, (20161109), pages 3871 - 3897, (20161109), XP036167535 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3876, paragraph 3 - page 3881, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-016-4048-0 | [A] - YU-PING HU ET AL, "Using two semi-fragile watermark for image authentication", MACHINE LEARNING AND CYBERNETICS, 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF 2005 INTERNATIO NAL CONFERENCE ON GUANGZHOU, CHINA 18-21 AUG. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050821), ISBN 978-0-7803-9091-1, page 5484, XP031385912 [A] 1-10 * page 5485, paragraph 3 - page 5486, paragraph 3.5 * | [A] - RUTH BUSE DILI ET AL, "An image watermarking method based on the singular value decomposition and the wavelet transform", AFRICON 2007, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0986-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031189656 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3.3 - page 3, paragraph 3.4 * | International search | [X]CN1381023 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-20 * description, page 3 line 9 to page 18 line 3, and claims 1-18 *; | [A]CN1453728 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN1517855 (CHENGDU YUFEI INFORMATION ENGI [CN]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101141466 (UNIV BEIJING JIAOTONG [CN]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]CN109087114 (LONGKOU SHENGFUDA FOOD CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |