EP3936884 - RADAR POWER CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Pengfei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Tong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
LUO, Pengfei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
JIANG, Tong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/02] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19920818.2 | 28.03.2019 | [2022/02] | WO2019CN80157 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020191727 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936884 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/40, G01S7/481, G01S17/42, G01S17/89, G01S17/931 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G01S7/484 (EP);
G01S13/865 (US);
G01S13/931 (US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/292 (US);
G01S7/40 (US);
G01S7/487 (US);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
G01S7/4013 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/02] | G01S7/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RADARLEISTUNGSTEUERUNG | [2022/02] | English: | RADAR POWER CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE RADAR | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2021 | Translation filed | 04.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10239432 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [X]WO2018055449 (INNOVIZ TECH LTD [IL]); | [A]KR101895727B (POONGSAN CORP [KR]) | International search | [A]CN1349612 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]CN204989458U (ZNPL OCEAN DETECTION SYSTEM ENG CO LTD); | [A]WO2018208958 (GOOGLE LLC [US]); | [A]CN109196373 (UHNDER INC) |