EP3952149 - SUBMARINE OPTICAL BRANCHING DEVICE, SUBMARINE OPTICAL CABLE SYSTEM, SWITCHING METHOD, NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE Ryota c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
ABE Ryota Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 19921814.0 | 12.11.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019JP44251 | Priority number, date | JP20190061901 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019061901 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194842 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3952149 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/27, H04B10/291, H04Q11/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04J14/0212 (EP);
H04B10/25 (US);
H04J14/0217 (EP);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0024 (EP);
H04Q2011/0037 (US);
H04Q2011/0039 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04J14/02, H04B10/27, H04B10/291 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE UNTERWASSERVERZWEIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, OPTISCHES UNTERWASSERKABELSYSTEM, SCHALTVERFAHREN, NICHTTRANSITORISCHES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2022/06] | English: | SUBMARINE OPTICAL BRANCHING DEVICE, SUBMARINE OPTICAL CABLE SYSTEM, SWITCHING METHOD, NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2022/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉRIVATION OPTIQUE SOUS-MARIN, SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE OPTIQUE SOUS-MARIN, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION, SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR NON TRANSITOIRE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2021 | Translation filed | 27.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002057477 (ROCCA CORRADO [IT], et al); | [E]EP3605890 (SUBCOM LLC [US]); | International search | [A]JPH09289488 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD, et al); | [YA]JPH10150409 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD, et al); | [YA]WO2012132688 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [YA]WO2016152115 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [YA]US2016301467 (JI PHILIP NAN [US], et al); | [YA]JP2017157985 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | JPH09289488 | JPH10150409 | JP2019061901 |