EP3957895 - OILFIELD PETROLEUM GATHERING PIPELINE HEATING AND HEAT PRESERVATION GRAPHENE SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhao, Anping Rm 12B06, 72th Building of Yuanyangtiandi Balizhuangxili, Chaoyang Dist. Beijing 100025 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Lanchava, Bakuri Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lanchava Messerschmittstraße 4 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/50] | Lanchava, Bakuri Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lanchava Sederanger 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/06] | Lanchava, Bakuri Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Lanchava Elsenheimerstraße 15 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19922409.8 | 10.07.2019 | [2022/06] | WO2019CN00142 | Priority number, date | CN201910263602 | 03.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910263602 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198898 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957895 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3957895 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, F16L53/30 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
F16L53/34 (EP);
F16L59/02 (KR);
F16L59/029 (US);
F16L53/30 (KR,US);
F16L59/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRAPHENUMMANTELUNG ZUR ERWÄRMUNG UND ZUM WÄRMEERHALT EINER ERDÖLSAMMELROHRLEITUNG IM ÖLFELD | [2022/06] | English: | OILFIELD PETROLEUM GATHERING PIPELINE HEATING AND HEAT PRESERVATION GRAPHENE SLEEVE | [2022/06] | French: | MANCHON EN GRAPHÈNE DE CONSERVATION DE CHALEUR ET DE CHAUFFAGE DE CANALISATION DE COLLECTE DE PÉTROLE DE CHAMP PÉTROLIFÈRE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2022 | Translation filed | 03.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/08] | 03.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 17.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10160089 (HOKKAIDO SEKISUI KOGYO KK); | [A]CN201354918Y (FUXIN ZHU [CN]); | [T]CN211115919U (ZHAO ANPING) | International search | [A]WO2014112953 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG]); | [A]CN205534838U (SHENZHEN GRAPHENE-LAND LEGEND TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109005607 (SHANDONG SHENGQUAN NEW MAT CO LTD); | [X]CN208479963U (HUARUI INK STONE DANYANG CO LTD); | [X]CN109882683 (ZHAO ANPING) |